CO HB1071 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the regulation of oil and gas operations in a manner consistent with the protection of public safety.
Title
Regulate Oil Gas Operations Protect Public Safety
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer House Bill 18-1071 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Postpone House Bill 18-1071 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 18-1071 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Postpone House Bill 18-1071 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 18-1071 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |
2018-02-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-08 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-07 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/08/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-06 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/07/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-01 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |