CO HB1072 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a requirement that Colorado institutions of higher education study potential uses of emerging technologies to more effectively manage Colorado's water supply, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation, conditioned on the receipt of matching funds from gifts, grants, and donations.
Title
Study Emerging Technologies For Water Management
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Postpone House Bill 20-1072 indefinitely. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-06 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1072, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1072, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 20-1072 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-06 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1072, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1072, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 20-1072 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Postpone Indefinitely |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2020-03-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-09 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2020-03-06 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-03-06 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-27 | House | House Committee on Rural Affairs & Agriculture Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2020-01-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Rural Affairs & Agriculture |