CO HB1077 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the modification of various provisions regarding the responsibilities of the county treasurer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifications Of County Treasurer Duties

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-24 Governor Signed
2020-03-23 Sent to the Governor
2020-03-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-03-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-13SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-12SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-10SenateSenate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-02-10SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government
2020-02-06HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-03HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-01-29HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-01-08HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1077
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1077_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1077_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1077_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1077_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1077_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1077_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/81c6a0857bd0ae02872584fe007f01a8-hb20-1077-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1077vote5c065c
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/81c6a0857bd0ae02872584fe007f01a8-hb20-1077-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/406a71f24330cc4087258527006fc6a3-hb20-1077-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1077vote53c3cf

Bill Comments

feedback