CO HB1082 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-24 - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-24 - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Ozone Levels Larimer & Weld AIR Program
Title
Ozone Levels Larimer & Weld AIR Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone indefinitely House Bill 11-1082 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone indefinitely House Bill 11-1082 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone indefinitely House Bill 11-1082 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1082, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1082, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1082, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone indefinitely House Bill 11-1082 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone indefinitely House Bill 11-1082 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1082, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1082, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1082, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-24 | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy Postpone Indefinitely | |
2011-03-04 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy | |
2011-02-22 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-02-21 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2011-02-18 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-03 | House Committee on Health and Environment Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2011-01-20 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health and Environment + Appropriations |