CO HB1082 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Change Name Area Vocational Schools
Title
Change Name Area Vocational Schools
Sponsors
Rep. Alec Garnett [D] | Sen. Nancy Todd [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1082 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1082 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1082 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1082 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1082 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1082 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | House | Governor Signed |
2016-03-22 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-03-22 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2016-02-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-02-10 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-02-03 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-01-19 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |