CO HB1084 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a requirement that notice of a determination on whether a particular land area is blighted be given to owners of private property within the area.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Notice To Property Owners Whether Area Blighted

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1084 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-06 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1084, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1084, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Governor Signed
2019-03-11 Sent to the Governor
2019-03-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-03-08HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-03-04SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-01SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-26SenateSenate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-02-11SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government
2019-02-11HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-08HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-02-06HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1084
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1084_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1084_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1084_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1084_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1084_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1084_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1f4d272800e6e5ba872583990070d184-hb19-1084-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1084vote5f6395
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1f4d272800e6e5ba872583990070d184-hb19-1084-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1f4d272800e6e5ba872583990070d184-hb19-1084-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0ecbb1a27ff68510872583ad007369a3-hb19-1084-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1084vote5eb815

Bill Comments

feedback