CO HB1086 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Rule Review Bill

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rule Review Bill

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved House Bill 12-1086, as amended, to the Senate committee of the whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - That the bill go to the consent calendar in the Senate. Senator Brophy objected to the motion so the motion was disregarded. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-04-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.006 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-02-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved House Bill 12-1086 to the committee of the whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - L001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-02-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved House Bill 12-1086 to the committee of the whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - L001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-15 Governor Action - Signed
2012-05-15 Sent to the Governor
2012-05-09 House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2012-05-07 House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2012-05-03 Senate Third Reading Passed
2012-05-02 Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2012-04-27 Senate Committee on Legal Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2012-02-22 Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Legal Services
2012-02-14 House Third Reading Passed
2012-02-13 House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
2012-02-09 House Committee on Legal Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2012-01-17 Introduced In House - Assigned to Legal Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/375634A0398D543E87257981007F1322?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/375634A0398D543E87257981007F1322/$FILE/1086_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/375634A0398D543E87257981007F1322/$FILE/1086ls_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/375634A0398D543E87257981007F1322/$FILE/1086_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/375634A0398D543E87257981007F1322/$FILE/1086_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/375634A0398D543E87257981007F1322/$FILE/1086sleg_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/375634A0398D543E87257981007F1322/$FILE/1086_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/375634A0398D543E87257981007F1322/$FILE/1086_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/375634A0398D543E87257981007F1322/$FILE/1086_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/7726FD1AD406B4DB8725799F005446B0
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/4FC53842F4B2E6E78725799F00544F38
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/7726FD1AD406B4DB8725799F005446B0
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/4FC53842F4B2E6E78725799F00544F38
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/983188157B577EA1872579ED006847A7
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/8E9F2DB4CE9BC6A1872579ED006888E7
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/6D5117CCAB19EFC2872579ED006868F4

Bill Comments

feedback