CO HB1086 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Legal Notice Statewide Web Site

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legal Notice Statewide Web Site

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1086 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1086 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1086, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-01-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1086, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-07HouseGovernor Signed
2014-02-26HouseSent to the Governor
2014-02-26HouseSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-02-25HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2014-02-21SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-02-20SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-02-17SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2014-02-03SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
2014-01-29HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-01-28HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2014-01-23HouseHouse Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2014-01-10HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Local Government

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/F6A0E3B9EBB8899B87257C300006E4C0?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/F6A0E3B9EBB8899B87257C300006E4C0/$FILE/1086_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/F6A0E3B9EBB8899B87257C300006E4C0/$FILE/1086lg_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/F6A0E3B9EBB8899B87257C300006E4C0/$FILE/1086_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/F6A0E3B9EBB8899B87257C300006E4C0/$FILE/1086_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/F6A0E3B9EBB8899B87257C300006E4C0/$FILE/1086_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/F6A0E3B9EBB8899B87257C300006E4C0/$FILE/1086_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/F6A0E3B9EBB8899B87257C300006E4C0/$FILE/1086_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/D17C7E823D51748A87257C690060AD03
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/6B455090690F0DE087257C6900615983
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E0B94DF19DBD7A7C87257C820072B303
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/D17C7E823D51748A87257C690060AD03
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/6B455090690F0DE087257C6900615983
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E0B94DF19DBD7A7C87257C820072B303

Bill Comments

feedback