CO HB1086 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Performance Audit Of DPA & State Personnel Board

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Performance Audit Of DPA & State Personnel Board

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1086 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1086 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1086 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-18HouseGovernor Signed
2016-03-10HouseSent to the Governor
2016-03-10HouseSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-03-04HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2016-02-29SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-02-26SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-02-23SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2016-02-05SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2016-02-04HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-02-03HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-02-01HouseHouse Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2016-01-19HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FE8ED7F87389B72787257F240065A3DA?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FE8ED7F87389B72787257F240065A3DA/$FILE/1086_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FE8ED7F87389B72787257F240065A3DA/$FILE/1086_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FE8ED7F87389B72787257F240065A3DA/$FILE/1086_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FE8ED7F87389B72787257F240065A3DA/$FILE/1086_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FE8ED7F87389B72787257F240065A3DA/$FILE/1086_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FE8ED7F87389B72787257F240065A3DA/$FILE/1086_enr.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FE8ED7F87389B72787257F240065A3DA/$FILE/1086_signed.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/3C783F63A555264A87257F4C007142C7
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jouhse)/035229267DE562F087257F4F00576A52/$FILE/Fb04.pdf#135
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/2B870D619D8F572D87257F620063EAAA
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/2B870D619D8F572D87257F620063EAAA
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jousen)/1831D119D1AE85D787257F680054AF0B/$FILE/jour_048.pdf#306

Bill Comments

feedback