CO HB1086 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 13 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-24 - Governor Became Law
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning allowing community colleges to offer a bachelor of science degree in nursing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community College Bachelor Science Degree Nursing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 58 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1086 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment C). (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.013 (Attachment D). (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1086 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.010) (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 55 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Adopt amendment L.003 [Attachment D] (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-01 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 18-1086, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 18-1086, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-24 Governor Became Law
2018-03-13 Sent to the Governor
2018-03-13SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-03-12HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2018-03-06SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2018-03-05SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-03-02SenateSenate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2018-03-01SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2018-02-27SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over to 3/01/2018 - No Amendments
2018-02-26SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2018-02-21SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2018-02-12SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
2018-02-12HouseHouse Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2018-02-09HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2018-02-05HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 02/09/2018 - No Amendments
2018-02-01HouseHouse Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2018-01-18HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb18-1086
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1086_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1086_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1086_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1086_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1086_rr2.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1086_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hhie2018a2018-02-01t133734z-hb18-1086-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hhie2018a2018-02-01t133734z-hb18-1086-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hhie2018a2018-02-01t133734z-hb18-1086-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1086vote6013d9
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1086vote5fda44
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1086vote600006
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/shhs2018a2018-02-21t114856z-hb18-1086-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/shhs2018a2018-02-21t114856z-hb18-1086-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/shhs2018a2018-02-21t114856z-hb18-1086-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/shhs2018a2018-02-21t114856z-hb18-1086-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1086vote5f9ed9
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1086vote5d97d5
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1086vote5d7951

Bill Comments

feedback