CO HB1086 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the conduct of plumbing inspections to ensure compliance with the plumbing law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Plumbing Inspections Ensure Compliance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 41 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 19-1086 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.005, as amended by L.006 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-06 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 19-1086, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 19-1086, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16 Governor Signed
2019-04-08 Sent to the Governor
2019-04-08SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-05HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-04-01SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-03-29SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-28SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2019-03-27SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-26SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-25SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-20SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
2019-03-11HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-08HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-03-06HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1086
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1086_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1086_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1086_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1086_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1086_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1086_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/007202faa21c8428872583b50070b238-hb19-1086-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/007202faa21c8428872583b50070b238-hb19-1086-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/007202faa21c8428872583b50070b238-hb19-1086-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1086vote5b24c5
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d4ffd246cce60b57872583c3006bd9ed-hb19-1086-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1086vote5462bd
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1086vote5b7ae4
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1086vote5b6915

Bill Comments

feedback