CO HB1087 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning online notice of public meetings of a local governmental entity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Public Meeting Notices Posted On Website

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25 Governor Signed
2019-04-23 Sent to the Governor
2019-04-23SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-22HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-04-08SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-05SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-02SenateSenate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-03-25SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government
2019-03-22HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-21HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-03-19HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1087
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1087_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1087_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1087_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1087_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1087_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1087_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f8b5d69481a5ce59872583c2005d8030-hb19-1087-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1087vote55e34f
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/52f28834cdc9060d872583d000731566-hb19-1087-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f8b5d69481a5ce59872583c2005d8030-hb19-1087-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1087vote5c35ad

Bill Comments

feedback