CO HB1087 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the enforcement of laws administered by the division of parks and wildlife, and, in connection therewith, modifying parks and wildlife statutes to correct vague and contradictory provisions of law and remove obsolete provisions of law.
Title
Parks And Wildlife Law Enforcement Statutes Cleanup
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 20-1087, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 20-1087, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 20-1087 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 20-1087, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 20-1087, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 20-1087 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-20 | Governor Signed | |
2020-03-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-02-28 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2020-02-27 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2020-02-13 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-12 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-11 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-01-30 | House | House Committee on Rural Affairs & Agriculture Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Rural Affairs & Agriculture |