CO HB1091 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning dementia diseases, and, in connection therewith, updating statutory references to dementia diseases and related disabilities.
Title
Dementia Diseases And Related Disabilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1091 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 18-1091 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1091 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 18-1091 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Governor Signed | |
2018-03-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 03/08/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2018-02-21 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-20 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 02/21/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-16 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-13 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-18 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |