CO HB1094 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-12 - House Third Reading Lost - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-12 - House Third Reading Lost - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the addition of basic life skills education to the list of courses for which public schools provide internet links to the department of education as part of the performance report.
Title
Internet Link To Basic Life Skills Education Courses
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Soper [R] | Sen. Rob Woodward [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-07 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 19-1094, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 19-1094, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-07 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 19-1094, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 19-1094, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-12 | House | House Third Reading Lost - No Amendments |
2019-02-11 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |