CO HB1095 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 22 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning physician assistants, and, in connection therewith, establishing requirements for the supervision of physician assistants, establishing liability for physician assistants, increasing the number of physician assistant members on the Colorado medical board, and making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physician Assistants Supervision And Liability

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1095 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1095, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1095, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1095, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment B). (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1095, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1095, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-09SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-09HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-04-22SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-04-19SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-18SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-16SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-03SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-03-19SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
2019-03-15HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-14HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-13HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-12HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-03-08HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-02-19HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1095
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1095_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1095_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1095_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1095_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1095_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1095_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2cff04f40a03e404872583a600649710-hb19-1095-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2cff04f40a03e404872583a600649710-hb19-1095-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2cff04f40a03e404872583a600649710-hb19-1095-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2cff04f40a03e404872583a600649710-hb19-1095-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a17e73c78afd0b70872583b70052d985-hb19-1095-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a17e73c78afd0b70872583b70052d985-hb19-1095-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1095vote55f6c7
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9015c130384bd86d872583d100684ce7-hb19-1095-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/becf96eb540025fe872583de004b1506-hb19-1095-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1095vote2992cc
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1095vote194fab
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1095vote196008
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9015c130384bd86d872583d100684ce7-hb19-1095-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback