CO HB1097 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the ability of a person eligible for prescription drug benefits to choose the pharmacy at which to fill a prescription drug order.
Title
Patient Choice Of Pharmacy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Postpone House Bill 18-1097 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Postpone House Bill 18-1097 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 18-1097 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Postpone House Bill 18-1097 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Postpone House Bill 18-1097 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 18-1097 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2018-02-23 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-22 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-20 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/22/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-15 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-18 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |