CO HB1106 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the rental application process for prospective tenants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rental Application Fees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 44 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Adopt amendment L.033 (Attachment M). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Adopt amendment L.032 (Attachment L). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1106, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1106, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.024) (Y: 22 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.020) (Y: 22 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-05 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-05 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-05 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.010 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-05 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 19-1106, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 19-1106, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25 Governor Signed
2019-04-22 Sent to the Governor
2019-04-22SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-19HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-03-28SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-03-27SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-03-26SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-03-22SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-21SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-03-20SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-19SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-02-25SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government
2019-02-21HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-20HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-02-19HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-02-15HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 02/19/2019 - No Amendments
2019-02-14HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-02-11HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 02/14/2019 - No Amendments
2019-02-05HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1106
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1106_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1106_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1106_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1106_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1106_rr2.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1106_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0f46a34996c01f2087258398005e0275-hb19-1106-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0f46a34996c01f2087258398005e0275-hb19-1106-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0f46a34996c01f2087258398005e0275-hb19-1106-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0f46a34996c01f2087258398005e0275-hb19-1106-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0f46a34996c01f2087258398005e0275-hb19-1106-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1106vote1309f6
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1106vote12c2af
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1106vote5a3271
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4019b30c16cdb303872583be00011db7-hb19-1106-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1106vote11bfcf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1106vote588086
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1106vote586cf7
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4019b30c16cdb303872583be00011db7-hb19-1106-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4019b30c16cdb303872583be00011db7-hb19-1106-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4019b30c16cdb303872583be00011db7-hb19-1106-2-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback