CO HB1107 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of the employment support and job retention services program within the division of employment and training in the department of labor and employment, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Employment Support Job Retention Services Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1107 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1107 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.009 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1107, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 19-1107 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1107 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1107 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.009 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1107, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 19-1107 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-20 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2019-04-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-04-26 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-30 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor + Appropriations |