CO HB1110 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning implementing media literacy in elementary and secondary education, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Media Literacy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: MISCELLANEOUS Amd (c.001) (Y: 23 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1110 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 19-1110, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.012 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1110, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-07 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.010 (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-07 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.009 (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-07 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 19-1110, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 19-1110, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: MISCELLANEOUS Amd (c.001) (Y: 23 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1110 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 19-1110, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.012 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1110, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-07 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.010 (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-07 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.009 (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-07 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 19-1110, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 19-1110, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-03 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-03 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2019-04-16 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-15 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-12 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-07 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-02-05 | House | House Committee on Education Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |