CO HB1113 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the protection of water quality from adverse impacts caused by mineral mining.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protect Water Quality Adverse Mining Impacts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 46 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 49 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 19-1113, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 19-1113, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 19-1113, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 19-1113, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04 Governor Signed
2019-03-27 Sent to the Governor
2019-03-27SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-03-26HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-03-18SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-03-14SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over to 03/18/2019
2019-03-14SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-13SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-03-12SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-11SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-07SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-02-11SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources
2019-02-07HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-06HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-02-04HouseHouse Committee on Rural Affairs & Agriculture Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Rural Affairs & Agriculture

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1113
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1113_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1113_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1113_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1113_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1113_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1113_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6e7b3830f49eff1987258397007372f2-hb19-1113-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1113vote5ed3b2
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6e7b3830f49eff1987258397007372f2-hb19-1113-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/082cd1b4f300af0b872583b600754d80-hb19-1113-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/082cd1b4f300af0b872583b600754d80-hb19-1113-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/082cd1b4f300af0b872583b600754d80-hb19-1113-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/082cd1b4f300af0b872583b600754d80-hb19-1113-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1113vote5bf65c
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1113vote618003
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1113vote5e8d9d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1113vote5e9f5f

Bill Comments

feedback