CO HB1114 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the implementation under state law by the commissioner of agriculture of federal produce safety standards for farms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agriculture Commissioner Farm Produce Safety

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 19-1114 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 19-1114, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 19-1114, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04 Governor Signed
2019-03-27 Sent to the Governor
2019-03-27SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-03-26HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-03-18SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-03-17SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-03-15SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-03-13SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-03-12SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-03-11SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-03-07SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-03-06SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-05SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2019-02-28SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-02-19SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources
2019-02-15HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-14HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-02-11HouseHouse Committee on Rural Affairs & Agriculture Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Rural Affairs & Agriculture

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1114
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1114_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1114_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1114_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1114_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1114_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1114_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/bfe227dbe4064cac8725839e00732632-hb19-1114-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/bfe227dbe4064cac8725839e00732632-hb19-1114-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1114vote5de896
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1114vote5de76a
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/45c31eebbfe68d69872583af00717b37-hb19-1114-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1114vote594fcc
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1114vote5dcb2c
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1114vote5de06e

Bill Comments

feedback