CO HB1120 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the designation of a campus liquor complex on the campus of an institution of higher education that is licensed to serve alcohol beverages for consumption on the licensed premises to allow the institution to obtain permits to serve alcohol beverages at other facilities within its campus liquor complex, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcohol Beverage License Higher Education Campus

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1120 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 17-1120 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1120, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 17-1120, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 17-1120, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-24 Governor Signed
2017-04-20 Sent to the Governor
2017-04-20SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-19HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2017-04-10SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-04-07SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2017-04-06SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2017-03-03SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
2017-03-01HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-02-28HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2017-02-24HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2017-02-07HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
2017-01-20HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb17-1120
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1120_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1120_en2.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1120_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1120_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1120_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1120_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hphc2017a2017-02-07t133242z-hb17-1120-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hphc2017a2017-02-07t133242z-hb17-1120-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/happ2017a2017-02-24t083204z-hb17-1120-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520House%2520Journal.pdf#360
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sblt2017a2017-03-15t140209z-hb17-1120-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sapp2017a2017-04-06t080035z-hb17-1120-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520Senate%2520Journal.pdf#727

Bill Comments

feedback