CO HB1127 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the rental application process for prospective tenants.
Title
Residential Landlord Rental Application
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1127 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1127 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 36 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1127, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1127, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1127 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 36 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1127, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1127, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs + Business, Labor, & Technology + Finance |
2018-02-26 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-23 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 02/26/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-22 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2018-02-20 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/22/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-16 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/20/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-12 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-19 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |