CO HB1133 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning land use entitlements affecting real property that has been disconnected from a municipality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Land Use Entitlements And Municipal Disconnection

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-14 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1133, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1133, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1133 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-01 Governor Signed
2020-03-23 Sent to the Governor
2020-03-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-03-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-14SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2020-03-13SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-12SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-03-10SenateSenate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-02-13SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government
2020-02-12HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-11HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-02-10HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-04HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-01-16HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1133
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1133_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1133_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1133_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1133_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1133_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1133_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/80250f6ac94370f4872585040076c9d4-hb20-1133-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1133vote5a7bd6
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c61cf9e683ce1d2787258527006e0d8e-hb20-1133-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1133vote53c3c6
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1133vote567a24
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1133vote5694ec
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c61cf9e683ce1d2787258527006e0d8e-hb20-1133-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback