CO HB1134 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning eligibility of kindergarten students funded through early childhood at-risk enhancement positions.
Title
Use Of Colorado Preschool Program Positions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 18-1134 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 18-1134 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 18-1134 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 18-1134 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Governor Signed | |
2018-04-04 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-04-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2018-02-21 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-20 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-14 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |