CO HB1145 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the safety consequences of a driver passing an official vehicle that displays a warning light.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Move Over Or Slow Down For Official Vehicle

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-10 Sent to the Governor
2020-04-03 Governor Signed
2020-03-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-14HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-03-13SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-12SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-10SenateSenate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-02-28SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
2020-02-27HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-24HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-02-21HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-02-18HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-01-17HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1145
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1145_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1145_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1145_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1145_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1145_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1145_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c5deedd82152d0b48725851200676c2e-hb20-1145-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1145vote5ad2d8
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c5deedd82152d0b48725851200676c2e-hb20-1145-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7cf5d89b787082fc87258527006e5e19-hb20-1145-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1145vote53c3be

Bill Comments

feedback