CO HB1146 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation under the sunset law of the measurement standards law.
Title
Sunset Measurement Standards Law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1146 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.002 [Attachment D]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1146, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer House Bill 18-1146 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1146 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1146 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1146 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.002 [Attachment D]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1146, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer House Bill 18-1146 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1146 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1146 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2018-04-12 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended to Finance |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |
2018-02-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-31 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |