CO HB1150 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning disallowing a court from granting bail after conviction to offenders who have committed certain felony crimes.
Title
No Bail For Stalking And Domestic Violence Offenders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1150 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1150 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.021 (Attachment G). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.016 (Attachment H). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1150, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1150, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1150 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1150 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.021 (Attachment G). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.016 (Attachment H). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1150, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1150, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Governor Signed | |
2017-04-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2017-04-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-31 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2017-03-02 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2017-02-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations |