CO HB1150 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the recreation of the consumer insurance council as an advisory body to the commissioner of insurance.
Title
Recreate Consumer Insurance Council
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1150 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1150 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1150 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1150, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1150, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1150 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1150 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1150 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1150, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1150, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Governor Signed | |
2019-04-08 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2019-03-06 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-05 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-03-04 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-03-01 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-02-28 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-13 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-01-29 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |