CO HB1153 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning measures to enable local district colleges to serve more students.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Colorado Mountain College And Direct Grants Annexation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 19-1153 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1153 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 19-1153 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05 Governor Signed
2019-03-28 Sent to the Governor
2019-03-28SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-03-27HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-03-20SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-19SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee on Education Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-03-07SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
2019-03-04HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-01HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-02-28HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2019-02-27HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-02-22HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-02-07HouseHouse Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-01-29HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Education + Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1153
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1153_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1153_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1153_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1153_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1153_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1153_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/03b3540459b1ad228725839a0073899b-hb19-1153-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/67cb47e989e540e5872583a90054f8a7-hb19-1153-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1153vote5f793f
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/938886e4601293a5872583bd006be9cc-hb19-1153-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1153vote55400d

Bill Comments

feedback