CO HB1155 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation of the physical therapy board, and, in connection therewith, implementing the recommendations contained in the 2017 sunset review and report by the department of regulatory agencies.
Title
Sunset Continue Physical Therapy Board Functions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 51 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Adopt Ccr (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Adopt (Y: 49 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - CC_HB18-1155_2018A: Adopt conference committee report CLHB1155.001 (Attachment A). (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Notcncr (Y: 60 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.026 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1155, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1155, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1155, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1155, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.023 [Attachment F]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1155, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1155 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1155 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A). (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1155, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1155, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Adopt Ccr (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Adopt (Y: 49 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - CC_HB18-1155_2018A: Adopt conference committee report CLHB1155.001 (Attachment A). (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Notcncr (Y: 60 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.026 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1155, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1155, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1155, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1155, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.023 [Attachment F]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1155, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1155 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1155 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A). (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1155, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1155, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-08 | House | House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2018-05-07 | First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Reengrossed w/ Amendments | |
2018-05-03 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee |
2018-04-30 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Finance |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2018-03-23 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-22 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2018-03-21 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/22/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-20 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/21/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-16 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-05 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-02-13 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Finance |
2018-01-31 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |