CO HB1155 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning adding certain conduct to the definition of sexual contact.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Additions To Definition Of Sexual Contact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1155 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1155 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04 Governor Signed
2019-03-28 Sent to the Governor
2019-03-28SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-03-27HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-03-19SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-18SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-13SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-02-20SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
2019-02-19HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-15HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-12HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-29HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1155
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1155_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1155_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1155_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1155_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1155_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1155_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/546620a69a7dc0db8725839f007f7869-hb19-1155-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1155vote606536
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0a8b75f3988994df872583bc00717976-hb19-1155-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1155vote53ab3f

Bill Comments

feedback