CO HB1156 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-04 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-04 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extend Repeal Date Cons Dist Grant Fund
Title
Extend Repeal Date Cons Dist Grant Fund
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Becker [R] | Sen. Mary Hodge [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended, recommend consent calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended, recommend consent calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1156, without amendment, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1156, without amendment, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - C.O.W. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - C.O.W. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1156 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1156 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended, recommend consent calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1156, without amendment, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1156, without amendment, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - C.O.W. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - C.O.W. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1156 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1156 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-04 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-04-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-04-25 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-20 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-04-18 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2011-04-15 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-05 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-04-01 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-03-17 | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2011-03-10 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy + Appropriations | |
2011-03-01 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-02-28 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed | |
2011-02-25 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-16 | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2011-01-28 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources + Appropriations |