CO HB1156 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-19 - Senate Third Reading Lost - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-19 - Senate Third Reading Lost - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Extend Pay Transparency Protection All Employees
Title
Extend Pay Transparency Protection All Employees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-04-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1156 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1156 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1156 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1156 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1156 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1156 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | House | Senate Third Reading Lost - No Amendments |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Lost - No Amendments |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2016-03-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-03-28 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-03-22 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-01-28 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |