CO HB1156 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a prohibition on conversion therapy by a licensed mental health care provider.
Title
Prohibits Conversion Therapy Mental Health Provider
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1156 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1156 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 17-1156 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1156 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 17-1156 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2017-03-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-06 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-02 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/06/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-02-28 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-06 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |