CO HB1159 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning modifications to the income tax credits for innovative motor vehicles.
Title
Modify Innovative Motor Vehicle Income Tax Credits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1159 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1159, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment D) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1159, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1159, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1159, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1159, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 19-1159 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1159 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1159, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment D) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1159, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1159, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1159, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1159, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 19-1159 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-03 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2019-04-24 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-23 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-23 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-11 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-02-25 | House | House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Unamended to Finance |
2019-01-29 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment + Finance |