CO HB1161 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the allocation of private activity bonds, and, in connection therewith, eliminating the bond allocation committee, requiring the state housing board to assume the allocation related functions of the committee, and eliminating the cap on the direct allocation fee paid to the department of local affairs.
Title
Private Activity Bond Allocation
Sponsors
Rep. Shannon Bird [D] | Sen. Faith Winter [D] | Sen. John Tate [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1161 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1161 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1161 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1161 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-20 | Governor Signed | |
2020-03-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-03-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2020-02-18 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-14 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-13 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-02-10 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |