CO HB1162 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - House Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - House Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a prohibition against a retail food establishment's distribution of an expanded polystyrene product for use as a container for ready-to-eat food.
Title
Prohibit Food Establishments' Use Of Polystyrene
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-13 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1162 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 20-1162, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 20-1162, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 20-1162, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 20-1162, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-28 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-03-13 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-24 | House | House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment |