CO HB1166 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Renewal Of Concealed Handgun Permits
Title
Renewal Of Concealed Handgun Permits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1166 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1166 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1166 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1166 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1166 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1166 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1166 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-14 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-03-07 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-03-07 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2014-02-17 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-14 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-11 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-02-06 | House | House Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government |