CO HB1166 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning necessary statutory amendments due to the automatic repeal of an enterprise zone act income tax credit for new business facility employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amendments Due To Automatic Repeal of Tax Credit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1166 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1166 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-01 Governor Signed
2020-03-23 Sent to the Governor
2020-03-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-03-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-09SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-06SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-03SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-02-21SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2020-02-20HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-19HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-02-18HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-14HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-02-13HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-02-10HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-01-28HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1166
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1166_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1166_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1166_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1166_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1166_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1166_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4a58f9b00899e0b68725850a00742fd7-hb20-1166-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1166vote59d626
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/105db1a3d7445c908725852000757223-hb20-1166-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1166vote593285

Bill Comments

feedback