CO HB1168 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the creation of the Colorado reinsurance program to provide reinsurance payments to health insurers to aid in paying high-cost insurance claims, and, in connection therewith, authorizing the commissioner of insurance to seek approval from the federal government to waive applicable federal requirements, request federal funds, or both, to enable the state to implement the program, making the program contingent upon waiver or funding approval, and making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Innovation Waiver Reinsurance Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 48 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.022) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1168 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1168, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1168, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1168, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 47 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-15 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1168, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment P). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1168, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1168, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17 Governor Signed
2019-05-15SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-15 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-14HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-03SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-05-02SenateSenate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2019-05-01SenateSenate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-30SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-04-30SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-29SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-04-25SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Finance
2019-04-09SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
2019-04-08HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-05HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-04-02HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 04/05/2019 - No Amendments
2019-04-01HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-29HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-25HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 03/28/2019 - No Amendments
2019-03-18HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 03/25/2019 - No Amendments
2019-03-15HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-02-27HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-02-01HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1168
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1168_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1168_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1168_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1168_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1168_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1168_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ca6cb773057b4090872583af000449bf-hb19-1168-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/333edb4c0e43c1e5872583be004da540-hb19-1168-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/333edb4c0e43c1e5872583be004da540-hb19-1168-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ca6cb773057b4090872583af000449bf-hb19-1168-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ca6cb773057b4090872583af000449bf-hb19-1168-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1168vote58d224
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b9dfdbf62272f6b6872583e7007171f6-hb19-1168-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d23bf0f7db43a9ab872583ec00074b23-hb19-1168-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/dfd32bb7b469c757872583ec006e7847-hb19-1168-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1168vote12c17d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1168vote81a952
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1168vote8158cf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1168vote58064c
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1168vote58456d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d23bf0f7db43a9ab872583ec00074b23-hb19-1168-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback