CO HB1172 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning an organizational recodification of title 12 of the Colorado Revised Statutes, and, in connection therewith, limiting substantive changes to those that conform similar provisions to achieve uniformity, eliminate redundancy, or allow for the consolidation of common provisions or that eliminate provisions that are archaic or obsolete.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Title 12 Recodification And Reorganization

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1172 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1172 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25 Governor Signed
2019-04-23 Sent to the Governor
2019-04-22HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-04-22SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-03SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-02SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-01SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-20SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/01/2019 - No Amendments
2019-03-19SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-18SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-14SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/18/2019 - No Amendments
2019-03-13SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-11SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/13/2019 - No Amendments
2019-03-08SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-07SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-04SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-02-27SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
2019-02-26HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-25HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2019-02-22HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 04/25/2019 - No Amendments
2019-02-20HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 02/22/2019 - No Amendments
2019-02-14HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-02-07HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1172
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1172_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1172_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1172_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1172_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1172_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1172_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0be8a7d0689e13d6872583a100714c8e-hb19-1172-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1172vote5cc952
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9912077fe829d6eb872583b300716f71-hb19-1172-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1172vote53d173

Bill Comments

feedback