CO HB1175 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-22 - Senate Committee on Health and Human Services Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-22 - Senate Committee on Health and Human Services Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Colorado-specific Solutions Instead Of Fed Regul
Title
Colorado-specific Solutions Instead Of Fed Regul
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Reverse the previous roll call vote and postpone indefinitely House Bill 12-1175 (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1175 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1175 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Reverse the previous roll call vote and postpone indefinitely House Bill 12-1175 (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1175 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1175 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1175 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1175 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Reverse the previous roll call vote and postpone indefinitely House Bill 12-1175 (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1175 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1175 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | Senate Committee on Health and Human Services Postpone Indefinitely | |
2012-03-13 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health and Human Services | |
2012-03-09 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-06 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-03-05 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed | |
2012-03-02 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-02-28 | House Committee on Economic and Business Development Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-01-20 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Economic and Business Development |