CO HB1176 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning continuation of the grant program in the department of corrections to provide funding to eligible community-based organizations that provide reentry services to offenders, and, in connection therewith, implementing the recommendations in the 2017 report of the department of regulatory agencies.
Title
Sunset Offender Reentry Grant Program
Sponsors
Sen. Pete Lee [D] | Rep. Cole Wist [R] | Sen. John Cooke [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1176 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1176 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 48 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1176, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1176, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-29 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1176, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1176, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1176 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1176 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 48 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1176, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1176, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-29 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1176, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1176, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-04-16 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-13 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-04-11 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-29 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-02-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |