CO HB1176 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the enactment of the "Health Care Cost Savings Act of 2019" that creates a task force to analyze health care financing systems in order to give the general assembly findings regarding the systems' costs of providing adequate health care to residents of the state, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Health Care Cost Savings Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 39 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.022) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1176 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1176 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Joint - Legislative Council: Refer House Bill 19-1176 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1176, as amended, to the Committee on Legislative Council. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1176, as amended, to the Committee on Legislative Council. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1176, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1176, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.022) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1176 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1176 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Joint - Legislative Council: Refer House Bill 19-1176 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1176, as amended, to the Committee on Legislative Council. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1176, as amended, to the Committee on Legislative Council. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1176, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1176, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-20 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-03 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2019-04-23 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-22 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-04-19 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-18 | House | House Committee on Legislative Council Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-17 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Legislative Council |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2019-02-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |