CO HB1178 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the name simplification of Western state Colorado university to Western Colorado university.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Name Simplification Of Western State Colorado University

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 19-1178 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 19-1178 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-04-10SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-09SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-04SenateSenate Committee on Education Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-03-11SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
2019-03-08HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-07HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-06HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-02-28HouseHouse Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-02-14HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Education

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1178
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1178_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1178_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1178_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1178_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1178_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1178_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b4724389bc8fdc5a872583af0073edde-hb19-1178-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1178vote5a9aa2
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/17803a90fa7ac751872583d2006fcffd-hb19-1178-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1178vote54231a

Bill Comments

feedback