CO HB1179 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the financial risk profiles of legal investments of public funds.
Title
Public Fund Investments
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Gray [D] | Sen. Pete Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 58 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1179, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1179, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-14 - House - House Finance: This is a conceptual amendment to L.003 strike lines 2 and 4 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-14 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C) as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-14 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1179, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1179, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1179, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1179, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-14 - House - House Finance: This is a conceptual amendment to L.003 strike lines 2 and 4 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-14 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C) as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-14 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1179, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1179, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-07 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-04-22 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2019-03-20 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-19 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |