CO HB1182 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the repeal of the sales tax exemption for sales to residents of bordering states without retail sales taxes.
Title
Residents Of Bordering States Sales Tax Exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 20-1182 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 20-1182 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 20-1182 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 20-1182 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-20 | Governor Signed | |
2020-03-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-03-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2020-02-20 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-19 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-18 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-02-12 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-30 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |