CO HB1188 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the inclusion of the net impact on greenhouse gas pollution in the fiscal notes prepared for legislative measures, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Greenhouse Gas Pollution Impact In Fiscal Notes
Sponsors
Rep. Emily Sirota [D] | Rep. Marc Snyder [D] | Sen. Mike Foote [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1188 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Joint - Legislative Council: Refer House Bill 19-1188 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1188, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment E). (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-04 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 19-1188 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 19-1188 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1188 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Joint - Legislative Council: Refer House Bill 19-1188 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1188, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment E). (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-04 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 19-1188 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 19-1188 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-03 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Legislative Council Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Legislative Council |
2019-04-16 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-15 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-12 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-04 | House | House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-02-19 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment + Appropriations |